Global Patent Index - EP 2023669 A2

EP 2023669 A2 2009-02-11 - Method for operating a hearing aid system and hearing aid system

Title (en)

Method for operating a hearing aid system and hearing aid system

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Hörgerätesystems und Hörgerätesystem

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le fonctionnement d'un système d'appareil auditif et système d'appareil auditif

Publication

EP 2023669 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104762 A

Priority

DE 102007037659 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves assigning sound producing output units to the microphones. The signals feedback-caused oscillations are detected by comparison of the microphone signals. The recognized feedback-caused oscillations to be introduced are measured for the reduction of the feedback-caused oscillations. The comparison of the microphone signals or signals derived includes a frequency-selective efficiency comparison. An independent claim is included for a hearing aid system with two microphones.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Hörgerätesystems mit mindestens zwei räumlich voneinander getrennt angeordneten Mikrofonen (1, 11) und diesen Mikrofonen zugeordneten schallerzeugenden Ausgabeeinheiten (3, 13), bei dem durch Vergleich der Mikrofonsignale oder daraus abgeleiteter Signale rückkopplungsbedingte Oszillationen detektiert und bei erkannten rückkopplungsbedingten Oszillationen Maßnahmen zur Reduzierung der rückkopplungsbedingten Oszillationen eingeleitet werden, wobei der Vergleich der Mikrofonsignale oder daraus abgeleiteten Signale einen frequenzselektiven Leistungsvergleich umfasst. Die Erfindung betrifft außerdem ein für dieses Verfahren geeignetes Hörgerätesystem.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/552 (2013.01); H04R 25/453 (2013.01); H04R 2430/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 10110258 C1 20020829 - SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023669 A2 20090211; EP 2023669 A3 20120919; DE 102007037659 A1 20090402; DE 102007037659 B4 20130613; US 2009041272 A1 20090212; US 8116490 B2 20120214

INPADOC legal status


2016-09-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160407

2015-11-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIVANTOS GMBH

2013-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130729

2013-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121019

2012-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-09-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04R 25/00 20060101AFI20120815BHEP

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS