Global Patent Index - EP 2023689 A2

EP 2023689 A2 2009-02-11 - Covering part for the underside of a hotplate and production method for same and hotplate with such a covering part and production method for same

Title (en)

Covering part for the underside of a hotplate and production method for same and hotplate with such a covering part and production method for same

Title (de)

Abdeckteil für die Unterseite einer Kochplatte und Herstellungsverfahren und Kochplatte mit einem solchen Abdeckteil und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Elément de recouvrement pour la partie inférieure d'une plaque de cuisson et procédé de fabrication et plaque de cuisson dotée d'un tel élément de recouvrement et procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 2023689 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013138 A

Priority

DE 102007038782 A

Abstract (en)

The part (11) has holes (28) for electrical connections (15, 17) and/or mechanical fastening connections such as anti twist stop bolts, and is made of pressed thermally insulating material such as phyllosilicate or vermiculite. The electrical connections and/or mechanical fastening connections are firmly integrated and firmly enclosed to a support. The fastening connections are spaced perpendicular from a lower surface of the part (11). The holes are provided for an additional mechanical fastening connection i.e. screw bolt (29), in the center of the covering part. Independent claims are also included for the following: (1) a method for manufacturing a covering part for a lower surface of a cooking plate (2) a method for manufacturing a cooking plate.

Abstract (de)

Ein Abdeckteil (11) für die Unterseite einer Kochplatte (30) ist im Wesentlichen flächig bzw. scheibenartig ausgebildet ist und weist Löcher (28) auf für Elektroanschlüsse (15, 17) und mechanische Befestigungsanschlüsse (26, 29). Es besteht aus verpresstem Wärmedämm-Material in Form von Vermiculite. Elektroanschlüsse (15, 17) für Heizelemente und Befestigungsanschlüsse (26) für die gesamte Kochplatte (30) sind fest integriert in das Abdeckteil (11) bzw. von dem Wärmedämm-Material umschlossen. Dabei können diese Teile beim Verpressen des Abdeckteils (11) aus losem Wärmedämm-Material darin eingepresst werden, also integral hergestellt sein.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/70 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023689 A2 20090211; EP 2023689 A3 20110413; DE 102007038782 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111014

2012-02-09 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20111221

2011-12-21 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-12-21 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-04-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-04-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS