Global Patent Index - EP 2023691 A1

EP 2023691 A1 2009-02-11 - Electroluminescence element

Title (en)

Electroluminescence element

Title (de)

Elektrolumineszenzelement

Title (fr)

Elément d'électroluminescence

Publication

EP 2023691 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08159576 A

Priority

DE 102007036151 A

Abstract (en)

The electrical luminescence element has an electrode arrangement (2a) located on a flat base carrier (1), a shining layer (3) and another electrode arrangement (4). The former electrode arrangement is electrically coupled to a control unit (5), which is arranged on the base carrier. A conducting strip (8) is arranged on the base carrier, and runs along one side of the shining layer and is in electrical contact with the control unit and with latter electrode arrangement.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben ist ein Elektrolumineszenzelement mit einer auf einem flachen Basisträger (1) angeordneten ersten Elektrodenanordnung (2), einer über der ersten Elektrodenanordnung (2) angeordneten Leuchtschicht (3) und einer über der Leuchtschicht angeordneten zweiten Elektrodenanordnung (4). Die erste und die zweite Elektrodenanordnung (2, 4) sind elektrisch an eine Steuereinheit (5) gekoppelt. Die Steuereinheit (5) ist auf dem Basisträger (1) angeordnet und somit in das Elektrolumineszenzelement integriert. Die zweite Elektrodenanordnung (2, 4) ist niederohmig an einen leitenden Streifen (8) (Busbar) angeschlossen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/04 (2006.01); H05B 33/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/28 (2013.01); H05B 33/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 10321152 A1 20041223 - SCHREINER GROUP GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2023691 A1 20090211

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130130

2009-10-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090818

2009-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090715

2009-02-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS