Global Patent Index - EP 2023723 A2

EP 2023723 A2 2009-02-18 - USE OF TETRAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR INSECT CONTROL

Title (en)

USE OF TETRAMIC ACID DERIVATIVES FOR INSECT CONTROL

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON TETRAMSÄUREDERIVATEN ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON INSEKTEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE DERIVES D'ACIDE TETRAMIQUE POUR LUTTER CONTRE LES INSECTES

Publication

EP 2023723 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725016 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004093 W
  • DE 102006022821 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131681A2] The invention relates to the use of compounds of formula (I), for the control of insects of the order of beetles (Coleoptera), thrips (Thysanoptera), bugs (Hemiptera), flies (Diptera), cicadas (Auchenorrhynchae), the families of the gall midges (Cecidomyiidae), leaf miners (Gracillariidae), leaf rollers (Tortricidae) and sawflies (Tenthredinidae), in which A, B, G, W, X, Y and Z have the above meanings.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/38 (2006.01); A01N 47/06 (2006.01); A01P 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01N 43/38 (2013.01); A01N 47/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131681A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022821 A1 20071115; AP 200804669 A0 20081231; AU 2007251861 A1 20071122; BR PI0711661 A2 20111116; CA 2651729 A1 20071122; CN 101489385 A 20090722; EA 200802316 A1 20090630; EP 2023723 A2 20090218; EP 2266399 A1 20101229; EP 2277377 A1 20110126; EP 2277378 A1 20110126; EP 2277379 A1 20110126; EP 2277380 A1 20110126; EP 2289316 A1 20110302; EP 2289317 A1 20110302; EP 2289318 A1 20110302; EP 2289319 A1 20110302; IL 195063 D0 20090803; JP 2009536930 A 20091022; KR 20090011025 A 20090130; MA 30494 B1 20090601; MX 2008014228 A 20081114; TW 200810693 A 20080301; US 2009298903 A1 20091203; US 2013072538 A1 20130321; WO 2007131681 A2 20071122; WO 2007131681 A3 20080626; ZA 200809605 B 20100127

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100918

2010-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100507

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCHER, REINER

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BRUECK, ERNST

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: VAN WAETERMEULEN, XAVIER, ALAIN, MARIE

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081229

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS