Global Patent Index - EP 2023756 A2

EP 2023756 A2 2009-02-18 - ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH OPEN UPPER

Title (en)

ARTICLE OF FOOTWEAR WITH OPEN UPPER

Title (de)

SCHUHARTIKEL MIT OFFENEM OBERMATERIAL

Title (fr)

CHAUSSURE DOTÉE D'UNE TIGE OUVERTE

Publication

EP 2023756 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07784316 A

Priority

  • US 2007070393 W
  • US 42226506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007277394A1] An article of footwear intended for use as a dance shoe is disclosed. The article of footwear includes an upper. The upper includes an opening with a periphery configured to expose the top of the instep of a foot, while covering the medial and lateral sides of the foot. In addition, the article of footwear includes a fastening system, comprising a first and second strap, configured to expand during insertion of the foot into the article of footwear and fasten the article of footwear to the foot.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/12 (2006.01); A43B 3/00 (2006.01); A43B 23/04 (2006.01); A43C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/12 (2013.01); A43B 3/0063 (2013.01); A43B 23/047 (2013.01); A43C 11/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007277394 A1 20071206; CN 101460070 A 20090617; CN 101460070 B 20110615; EP 2023756 A2 20090218; EP 2023756 A4 20121114; EP 2023756 B1 20160928; WO 2007143643 A2 20071213; WO 2007143643 A3 20080828

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180522

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170629

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170531

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170511

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007048107

2017-05-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-11-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007048107

2016-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2016-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2016-05-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160421

2016-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 3/00 20060101ALI20160314BHEP

2016-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 5/12 20060101AFI20160314BHEP

2016-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 23/04 20060101ALI20160314BHEP

2016-04-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43C 11/00 20060101ALI20160314BHEP

2014-08-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NIKE INNOVATE C.V.

2012-11-14 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20121016

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 23/04 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 5/12 20060101AFI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43B 3/00 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2012-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A43C 11/00 20060101ALI20121010BHEP

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS