Global Patent Index - EP 2023764 A2

EP 2023764 A2 2009-02-18 - OPENABLE KEYRING

Title (en)

OPENABLE KEYRING

Title (de)

ZU ÖFFNENDER SCHLÜSSELRING

Title (fr)

ANNEAU PORTE-CLÉ POUVANT S'OUVRIR

Publication

EP 2023764 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07734712 A

Priority

  • IB 2007001420 W
  • IT MI20061039 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138459A2] Openable ring (1) consisting of a main portion (10) and at least two further portions (12, 14). Said further portions comprising one or more intermediate portions (12) and an end portion (14). The first end of the intermediate portion (12) is hinged to the first end of the main portion (10) and the second end of the intermediate portion (12), is hinged to the first end of the end portion (14) on a rotation axis perpendicular to the plane on which the ring lies. Possible intermediate portions (12) beyond the first are hinged together at the respective ends on rotation axes perpendicular to the plane on which the ring lies. The second ends of the main portion (10) and of the end portion (14) are equipped with removable mutual coupling means (20, 22). The main, intermediate and end portions (10, 12, 14) are each made with a succession of two or more plates (24) piled up along a direction perpendicular to the plane of extension of the ring (1) and joined together through fixed coupling means (30).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 9/00 (2006.01); A44B 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138459A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007138459 A2 20071206; WO 2007138459 A3 20080214; EP 2023764 A2 20090218; IT MI20061039 A1 20071130

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110408

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: D-EFFE S.R.L.

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081118

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS