Global Patent Index - EP 2023766 A1

EP 2023766 A1 2009-02-18 - APPLIQUÉ DEVICE FOR THE USE OF AN APPLIQUÉ FLUID ON KERATINACEOUS FIBERS

Title (en)

APPLIQUÉ DEVICE FOR THE USE OF AN APPLIQUÉ FLUID ON KERATINACEOUS FIBERS

Title (de)

APPLIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ANWENDUNG EINER APPLIKATIONSFLÜSSIGKEIT AUF KERATINISCHEN FASERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'APPLICATION POUR UTILISER UN LIQUIDE D'APPLICATION SUR DES FIBRES DE KÉRATINE

Publication

EP 2023766 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729636 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055216 W
  • DE 102006026269 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141163A1] This invention relates to an appliqué device (1) for the use of an appliqué fluid on keratinaceous fibers with at least one container (2) to hold the appliqué fluid, with an appliqué head (3) connected to the at least one container (2) and a porous application body (31) for applying the appliqué fluid by coating the fibers, wherein the appliqué fluid contains at least one oxidation dye precursor and is mixed with an oxidizing agent composition immediately before use.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 19/02 (2013.01); A61K 8/22 (2013.01); A61Q 5/10 (2013.01); A45D 2019/0066 (2013.01); A45D 2200/058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141163A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026269 A1 20071206; EP 2023766 A1 20090218; WO 2007141163 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121207

2012-12-07 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2012-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120612

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS