Global Patent Index - EP 2023775 A1

EP 2023775 A1 2009-02-18 - BUILT-IN KITCHEN, KITCHEN EQUIPMENT, AND CONTROL ELEMENT THEREFOR

Title (en)

BUILT-IN KITCHEN, KITCHEN EQUIPMENT, AND CONTROL ELEMENT THEREFOR

Title (de)

EINBAUKÜCHE, KÜCHENEINRICHTUNG UND BEDIENELEMENT HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

CUISINE INTÉGRÉE, ÉQUIPEMENT POUR CUISINE ET ÉLÉMENT DE COMMANDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 2023775 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07711847 A

Priority

  • EP 2007001987 W
  • DE 202006008658 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137638A1] Disclosed is kitchen equipment, especially a kitchen range of a built-in kitchen, comprising a working surface (3), a working space or a recess (4) located above the working surface, and a plurality of electrical devices (2a, 2b), especially a plurality of built-in kitchen appliances. A control element (1) which adjoins the working space or recess (4) above the working surface (3) is provided for triggering the plurality of electrical devices (2a, 2b).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 77/02 (2013.01); F24C 7/082 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137638A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 202006008658 U1 20071004; EP 2023775 A1 20090218; WO 2007137638 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110422

2011-05-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-04-22 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2010-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100311

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081030

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS