Global Patent Index - EP 2023822 A2

EP 2023822 A2 2009-02-18 - CATHETER BASED MITRAL VALVE REPAIR METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

CATHETER BASED MITRAL VALVE REPAIR METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

KATHETERBASIERTE MITRAKLAPPEN-REPARATURMETHODE UND GERÄT

Title (fr)

MÉTHODE ET APPAREIL DE RÉPARATION DE LA VALVULE MITRALE À L'AIDE D'UN CATHÉTER

Publication

EP 2023822 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07709280 A

Priority

  • RS 2007000006 W
  • RS P20060147 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007100268A2] Method and devices including novel suture composition, catheter type suture transporters, pushers -and tying instruments, implant-pledget for anchoring onto the mitral leaflet, myocardial free wall entry site occluder, and technique for catheter based treatment of mitral regurgitation are presented. In one embodiment, a leaflet tension apparatus is implanted to adjust the systolic leaflet amplitude excursion. A continuous guiding suture track is created from the direct left ventricular puncture site through one or two puncture sites of the leaflet (1114) via the transseptal catheter and femoral vein; a pledget-implant (84) is apposed onto the exteriorized distal (venous) suture end via its integrated suture part and is anchored onto the atrial leaflet surface (11141) by retracting the guiding suture from the epicardial end. Silicon tube (70) is interposed between the leaflet and the free myocardial wall (1113) covering the implant's integrated sutures (841) which are directed through the free myocardial wall oclluder (90) and secured to its epicardial segment by an adjustable knot (9021x841) so as to keep the leaflet at the wanted distance during systole whilst the valve opening remains unhindered.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/0401 (2013.01); A61B 17/0469 (2013.01); A61B 17/0482 (2013.01); A61F 2/2457 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00243 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00783 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0404 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0406 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0409 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0414 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0474 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0477 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0496 (2013.01); A61F 2/2463 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007100268A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007100268 A2 20070907; WO 2007100268 A3 20081002; WO 2007100268 B1 20081113; EP 2023822 A2 20090218; RS 20060147 A 20080404

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101215

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100604

2009-10-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090729

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS