Global Patent Index - EP 2023828 A2

EP 2023828 A2 2009-02-18 - METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANCHORING TO SOFT TISSUE

Title (en)

METHODS AND DEVICES FOR ANCHORING TO SOFT TISSUE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERANKERUNG AN WEICHTEILEN

Title (fr)

MÉTHODES ET APPAREILS POUR ANCRER À UN TISSU MOU

Publication

EP 2023828 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07751349 A

Priority

  • US 2007004580 W
  • US 44936506 A
  • US 64010606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007145684A2] The present invention relates to a tissue securement system, device and method for endoscopy or endosonography-guided transluminal interventions whereby a ligation is placed and secured into tissue. An objective of this invention is to provide a stable securement platform for the coupling of secondary anchors to the gastro-intestinal tract. Specifically, endosonography is used to insert an anchoring element through the walls of adjacent body cavities. The ends of the anchoring element are coupled together to form a loop. This anchoring element can be used to secure other anchors or devices to the gastro intestinal tract.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/08 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61B 17/04 (2006.01); A61B 17/062 (2006.01); A61B 17/12 (2006.01); A61B 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/0469 (2013.01); A61B 17/0401 (2013.01); A61B 17/0482 (2013.01); A61B 17/0487 (2013.01); A61B 17/0625 (2013.01); A61B 17/12013 (2013.01); A61B 2017/003 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00827 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0409 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0454 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0464 (2013.01); A61B 2017/06176 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007145684 A2 20071221; WO 2007145684 A3 20090409; EP 2023828 A2 20090218; EP 2023828 A4 20141224

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150623

2015-05-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ADVENT MEDICAL, INC.

2014-12-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20141125

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/04 20060101ALI20141119BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/08 20060101AFI20141119BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/062 20060101ALI20141119BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/12 20060101ALI20141119BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/00 20060101ALI20141119BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/06 20060101ALN20141119BHEP

2010-03-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61B 17/08 20060101AFI20090512BHEP

2009-05-13 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090409

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS