Global Patent Index - EP 2023861 A1

EP 2023861 A1 2009-02-18 - FEMORAL COMPONENT FOR A TOTAL HIP ENDOPROSTHESIS

Title (en)

FEMORAL COMPONENT FOR A TOTAL HIP ENDOPROSTHESIS

Title (de)

FEMURKOMPONENTE FÜR EINE HÜFTTOTAL-ENDOPROTHESE

Title (fr)

COMPOSANT FÉMORAL POUR PROTHÈSE TOTALE DE HANCHE

Publication

EP 2023861 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06721966 A

Priority

CH 2006000267 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134464A1] The femoral component for a total hip endoprothesis comprises A) a shaft (1) of length L intended to be anchored in the marrow cavity of the femur which comprises a distal half (13) suitable for introducing into the marrow channel with a tip (6), a proximal half (14), an anterior blade side (2), a posterior blade side (3), a lateral side surface (4), a medial side surface (5), a plane of symmetry (9) running between the two blade sides (2,3), and a midplane (10) running between the side surfaces (4,5) and through the tip (6) orthogonal to the plane of symmetry (9); wherein the distal half (13) has a first quarter (15) located at the end and a second quarter (16) abutting on the proximal half (14), and the proximal half (14) has a third quarter (17) abutting on the distal half (13), and a fourth quarter (18) located at the end; and B) a neck section (7) running at an obtuse angle to the longitudinal center axis (11) - defined as an intersection line between the two planes (9,10) - and connected to the proximal half (14) with a pin (8) for receiving a joint head or a joint head which is connected in a fixed manner to the neck section (7); wherein C) the distal half (13) is at least in part provided with a plurality of longitudinal grooves (12), and D) at least some of the longitudinal grooves (12) do not run parallel to the midplane (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/3662 (2013.01); A61F 2/30767 (2013.01); A61F 2/36 (2013.01); A61F 2/367 (2013.01); A61F 2/3672 (2013.01); A61F 2/3676 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3011 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30125 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30136 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30138 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30332 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30828 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30838 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3084 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30879 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30906 (2013.01); A61F 2002/3625 (2013.01); A61F 2002/365 (2013.01); A61F 2220/0033 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0002 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0004 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0008 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0017 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00023 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00407 (2013.01); A61F 2310/00796 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134464A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134464 A1 20071129; EP 2023861 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140121

2013-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130709

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STAEUBLI, HANS ULRICH

2009-08-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: STAEUBLI, HANS ULRICH

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU