Global Patent Index - EP 2023866 A1

EP 2023866 A1 2009-02-18 - SURGICAL EXTRACTOR

Title (en)

SURGICAL EXTRACTOR

Title (de)

CHIRURGISCHER EXTRAKTOR

Title (fr)

EXTRACTEUR CHIRURGICAL

Publication

EP 2023866 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725144 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004224 W
  • DE 102006024809 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006024809A1] Surgical extractor (20) comprises a support plate (4) with a hinge part (5) and two fork-like sides (21, 21~) inserted into the intermediate chamber between support plates to support blocking elements (22, 22~). An extraction unit (24, 25, 26) transfers a traction force to the fork-like sides in the longitudinal direction. Preferred Features: The fork-like sides are detachedly connected to the extraction unit. The blocking elements are formed as rigid T-shaped protrusions molded to the ends of the fork-like sides.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/4611 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30172 (2013.01); A61F 2002/30471 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4619 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4628 (2013.01); A61F 2002/4681 (2013.01); A61F 2220/0091 (2013.01); A61F 2230/0052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137688A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024809 A1 20071129; CN 101453962 A 20090610; EP 2023866 A1 20090218; US 2009209968 A1 20090820; US 2012116519 A1 20120510; WO 2007137688 A1 20071206; ZA 200808761 B 20091125

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130522

2013-02-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-12-01 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20090119

2010-12-01 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20091210

2009-03-11 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

- Effective date: 20090119

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081113

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS