Global Patent Index - EP 2023894 A2

EP 2023894 A2 2009-02-18 - FIXED COMBINATION DOSAGE FORMS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MIGRAINE

Title (en)

FIXED COMBINATION DOSAGE FORMS FOR THE TREATMENT OF MIGRAINE

Title (de)

FIXE KOMBINATIONSDOSIERFORMEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MIGRÄNE

Title (fr)

FORMES POSOLOGIQUES COMBINÉES DÉTERMINÉES DESTINÉES AU TRAITEMENT DE LA MIGRAINE

Publication

EP 2023894 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07755975 A

Priority

  • US 2007009953 W
  • US 79521406 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007127207A2] Therapeutic regimens and dosage forms are disclosed for the treatment of migraine headache. The regimens preferably combine a serotonin receptor agonist, such as sumatriptan, eletriptan or almotriptan, with a fast acting formulation of diclofenac potassium.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01N 37/12 (2006.01); A01N 37/44 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2013.01); A61K 31/196 (2013.01); A61K 31/4045 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/196 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 31/4045 + A61K 2300/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007127207 A2 20071108; WO 2007127207 A3 20081204; CA 2661819 A1 20071108; CA 2661819 C 20140729; EP 2023894 A2 20090218; EP 2023894 A4 20101020; JP 2009535336 A 20091001; US 2010016363 A1 20100121

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110416

2010-10-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100916

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: APR APPLIED PHARMA RESEARCH S.A.

2009-11-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090604

2009-07-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 37/12 20060101AFI20090402BHEP

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A01N 37/44 20060101ALI20090402BHEP

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 9/00 20060101ALI20090402BHEP

2009-05-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/195 20060101ALI20090402BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS