Global Patent Index - EP 2023904 A2

EP 2023904 A2 2009-02-18 - SUSTAINED RELEASE COATED TABLET WITH PRECISELY REGULATED RELEASE PROFILE

Title (en)

SUSTAINED RELEASE COATED TABLET WITH PRECISELY REGULATED RELEASE PROFILE

Title (de)

ÜBERZOGENE TABLETTE MIT VERZÖGERTER FREISETZUNG UND PRÄZISE REGULIERTEM FREISETZUNGSPROFIL

Title (fr)

COMPRIMÉ ENROBÉ À LIBÉRATION PROLONGÉE AYANT UN PROFIL DE LIBÉRATION PRÉCISEMENT RÉGULÉ

Publication

EP 2023904 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07747745 A

Priority

  • PL 2007000036 W
  • PL 37983106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007142546A2] The present invention relates to a novel stable pharmaceutical composition in the form of a sustained release coated tablet comprising an active ingredient, carbomer and pharmaceutically acceptable excipients with a release profile that is precisely regulated by the parameters of the coating process, the use of carbomer for manufacturing the tablet and the process of coating the tablet using a water-based coating suspension.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/2027 (2013.01); A61K 9/2009 (2013.01); A61K 9/2054 (2013.01); A61K 9/2866 (2013.01); A61K 31/135 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/404 (2013.01); A61K 31/445 (2013.01); A61K 31/495 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007142546A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007142546 A2 20071213; WO 2007142546 A3 20080221; EP 2023904 A2 20090218; PL 204780 B1 20100226; PL 379831 A1 20071210

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120102

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-05-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090406

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MAZGALSKI, JAROSLAW

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSS MALCOLM STEWART, FRANK

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS