Global Patent Index - EP 2023907 A1

EP 2023907 A1 2009-02-18 - TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING SUFENTANIL AND ITS ANALOGUES

Title (en)

TRANSDERMAL DELIVERY SYSTEM COMPRISING SUFENTANIL AND ITS ANALOGUES

Title (de)

TRANSDERMALES ABGABESYSTEM MIT SUFENTANIL UND SEINEN ANALOGA

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE LIBERATION CUTANEE COMPRENANT DU SUFENTANIL ET SES ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 2023907 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07724434 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003498 W
  • DE 102006019293 A
  • US 90350507 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007121949A1] Methods and systems for the transdermal delivery of sufentanil and its analogs are described, from patches having a unique pharmacodynamic profile that can be used to treat persistent pain over extended periods and acute pain episodes of limited duration.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/7053 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007121949A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007121949 A1 20071101; WO 2007121949 A8 20081127; CA 2646206 A1 20071101; EP 2023907 A1 20090218; JP 2009534343 A 20090924

INPADOC legal status


2014-06-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140121

2013-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130909

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: LABTEC GMBH

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS