Global Patent Index - EP 2023960 A1

EP 2023960 A1 2009-02-18 - CONJUGATES OF AZIRIDINYL-EPOTHILONE ANALOGS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

CONJUGATES OF AZIRIDINYL-EPOTHILONE ANALOGS AND PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

KONJUGATE VON AZIRIDINYL-EPOTHILON-ANALOGA UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

CONJUGUÉS D'ANALOGUES D'AZIRIDINYL-ÉPOTHILONE ET COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES LES INCLUANT

Publication

EP 2023960 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07762328 A

Priority

  • US 2007069740 W
  • US 80836706 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140298A1] The present invention is directed to conjugated compounds comprising a folate, or an analog or derivative thereof, and an aziridinyl epothilone analog, as further described herein, and/or pharmaceutically-acceptable salts and/or solvates thereof, useful in the treatment of cancer or other folate-receptor associated conditions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 519/00 (2013.01); A61K 47/551 (2017.08); A61K 47/65 (2017.08); C07D 491/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140298A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140298 A1 20071206; AR 062448 A1 20081112; AU 2007267536 A1 20071206; BR PI0712165 A2 20120214; CA 2657276 A1 20071206; CN 101495154 A 20090729; EA 200802390 A1 20090630; EP 2023960 A1 20090218; IL 195237 D0 20090803; JP 2009538350 A 20091105; KR 20090025267 A 20090310; MX 2008014788 A 20081202; NO 20084752 A 20081217; PE 01022008 A1 20080211; TW 200813065 A 20080316; US 2007275904 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-18 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1124264

2011-08-24 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110218

2009-09-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-07-10 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1124264

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS