Global Patent Index - EP 2024017 A2

EP 2024017 A2 2009-02-18 - LEAD SET FOR NERVE STIMULATOR AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF

Title (en)

LEAD SET FOR NERVE STIMULATOR AND METHOD OF OPERATION THEREOF

Title (de)

ELEKTRODENSET FÜR NERVENSTIMULATOR UND BEDIENUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE FILS POUR STIMULATEUR NERVEUX ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 2024017 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794997 A

Priority

  • US 2007011847 W
  • US 80158906 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136713A2] Single-use electrical leads for a nerve stimulator are disclosed. The leads include a status flag element such as a fuse, which is deliberately blown after use of the leads has begun to indicate that the leads are not to be reused. The nerve stimulator has a "test mode" that determines a current value for treatment, and a "therapy mode" that administers treatment with the chosen current value. If the fuse in the electrical leads is blown (not conducting), then the stimulator assumes that the leads have already been used and does not enter therapy mode, and optionally may not enter test mode. If the fuse in the electrical leads is intact (conducting), or not blown, then the stimulator assumes that the leads are as yet unused, and allows the user to enter either test mode or therapy mode. The fuse is deliberately blown after a particular amount of time spent in therapy mode. After the fuse is blown, the user may still complete the therapy mode, even though the fuse is non-conducting, although the user may not initiate another therapy mode (and optionally may not initiate another test mode) using the blown leads. Preferably the fuse is electrically isolated from the leads that contact the patient.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/05 (2006.01); A61N 1/36 (2006.01); A61N 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36007 (2013.01); A61N 1/0551 (2013.01); A61N 1/36021 (2013.01); A61N 1/36025 (2013.01); A61N 1/3752 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136713 A2 20071129; WO 2007136713 A3 20081106; EP 2024017 A2 20090218; EP 2024017 A4 20100113

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130424

2012-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120625

2010-01-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091214

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/05 20060101AFI20091208BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/36 20060101ALI20091208BHEP

2010-01-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/34 20060101ALN20091208BHEP

2009-10-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS