Global Patent Index - EP 2024018 A2

EP 2024018 A2 2009-02-18 - PORTABLE ASSEMBLIES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING FUNCTIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC NEUROSTIMULATION

Title (en)

PORTABLE ASSEMBLIES, SYSTEMS, AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING FUNCTIONAL OR THERAPEUTIC NEUROSTIMULATION

Title (de)

TRAGBARE ANORDNUNGEN, SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG FUNKTIONELLER ODER THERAPEUTISCHER NEUROSTIMULATION

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLES PORTABLES, SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE FOURNIR UNE NEUROSTIMULATION FONCTIONNELLE OU THÉRAPEUTIQUE

Publication

EP 2024018 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07777138 A

Priority

  • US 2007011867 W
  • US 80131506 P
  • US 54533606 A
  • US 54533906 A
  • US 59555606 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007136726A2] Neurostimulation assemblies, systems, and methods make possible the providing of short-term therapy or diagnostic testing by providing electrical connections between muscles or nerves inside the body and stimulus generators or recording instruments mounted on the surface of the skin or carried outside. the body. Neurostimulation "assemblies, systems, and methods may include a carrier and a removable electronics pod, the electronics pod including stimulation generation circuitry, a power input bay to hold a disposable power source, and user interface components. The assemblies, systems, and methods are adapted to provide coordinated neurostimulation to multiple regions of the body.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/36 (2006.01); A61N 1/04 (2006.01); H01M 6/50 (2006.01); H01M 10/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/0504 (2013.01); A61N 1/36014 (2013.01); A61N 1/36003 (2013.01); A61N 1/36017 (2013.01); A61N 1/36021 (2013.01); A61N 1/36071 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007136726 A2 20071129; WO 2007136726 A3 20080605; AU 2007254204 A1 20071129; CA 2652565 A1 20071129; EP 2024018 A2 20090218; EP 2024018 A4 20100421; JP 2009537226 A 20091029

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128896

2012-05-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111122

2010-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100628

2010-04-21 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100322

2010-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/36 20060101AFI20100316BHEP

2010-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61N 1/04 20060101ALN20100316BHEP

2010-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 10/42 20060101ALN20100316BHEP

2010-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H01M 6/50 20060101ALN20100316BHEP

2009-11-13 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1128896

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS