Global Patent Index - EP 2024058 A1

EP 2024058 A1 2009-02-18 - METHOD FOR ABSORBING CHLORINE FROM A GAS CONTAINING CHLORINE AND CARBON DIOXIDE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR ABSORBING CHLORINE FROM A GAS CONTAINING CHLORINE AND CARBON DIOXIDE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ABSORPTION VON CHLOR AUS EINEM CHLOR- UND KOHLENDIOXID ENTHALTENDEN GAS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ D'ABSORPTION DE CHLORE D'UN GAZ CONTENANT DU CHLORE ET DU DIOXYDE DE CARBONE

Publication

EP 2024058 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725012 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004089 W
  • DE 102006023939 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007269358A1] The present invention relates to a process for absorbing chlorine from a gas containing chlorine and carbon dioxide, in particular to a process for washing small amounts of chlorine out of a waste gas stream containing a large excess of carbon dioxide, wherein the washed waste gas can be released directly into the atmosphere.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/14 (2006.01); B01D 53/68 (2006.01); C01B 7/01 (2006.01); C01B 7/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/68 (2013.01); C01B 7/0743 (2013.01); B01D 2251/304 (2013.01); B01D 2257/2025 (2013.01); Y02P 20/152 (2015.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134717A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006023939 A1 20071122; CN 101448560 A 20090603; EP 2024058 A1 20090218; JP 2009537294 A 20091029; KR 20090019789 A 20090225; RU 2008150040 A 20100627; TW 200815092 A 20080401; US 2007269358 A1 20071122; WO 2007134717 A1 20071129; WO 2007134717 A8 20081204

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091216

2009-07-08 [R17C] DESPATCH OF FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090605

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090522

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOORMANN, GERHARD

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MALCHOW, RICHARD C/O POLYURETANES CO.LTD SHANGHAI

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WERNER, KNUD

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KAEMPER, FRIEDHELM

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS