Global Patent Index - EP 2024081 A2

EP 2024081 A2 2009-02-18 - COMPOSITIONS USED ESPECIALLY FOR TRAPPING NITROGEN OXIDES (NOX)

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS USED ESPECIALLY FOR TRAPPING NITROGEN OXIDES (NOX)

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, DIE INSBESONDERE ZUM ABFANGEN VON STICKSTOFFOXIDEN (NOX) VERWENDET WERDEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS À BASE D'ALUMINE, CERIUM ET BARYUM OU/ET STRONTIUM UTILISEES NOTAMMENT POUR LE PIEGEAGE D'OXYDES D'AZOTE (NOX)

Publication

EP 2024081 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07728853 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054400 W
  • FR 0604356 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131902A2] This invention concerns an alumina-based composition particularly for permitting the tapping of nitrogen oxides that are contained in a gaseous fluid. This composition is formed by alumina, cerium and a divalent metal M chosen from the group which includes barium, strontium or an association of these two elements and it is characterized in that at least 10% of the weight of element M expressed by weight of oxide in contrast to the total weight of the composition and also in that the aluminate compound of the metal element M, formula MAI204, is absent. In other words this compound is not detectable by x-ray diffraction of the composition, following its calcinations with the air at 700ºC for two hours.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 20/06 (2006.01); B01J 20/08 (2006.01); B01J 21/04 (2006.01); B01J 23/00 (2006.01); B01J 23/10 (2006.01); B01J 23/42 (2006.01); B01J 37/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01D 53/9422 (2013.01); B01J 23/002 (2013.01); B01J 23/10 (2013.01); B01J 23/63 (2013.01); B01J 37/0045 (2013.01); B01D 2255/1021 (2013.01); B01D 2255/204 (2013.01); B01D 2255/2042 (2013.01); B01D 2255/2065 (2013.01); B01D 2258/012 (2013.01); B01J 2523/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01J 2523/00 + B01J 2523/25 + B01J 2523/31 + B01J 2523/3712

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131902A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131902 A2 20071122; WO 2007131902 A3 20080522; CA 2651938 A1 20071122; CA 2651938 C 20160823; CN 101448567 A 20090603; CN 101448567 B 20120606; EP 2024081 A2 20090218; FR 2901155 A1 20071123; FR 2901155 B1 20081010; JP 2009537297 A 20091029; JP 2012167010 A 20120906; JP 5718269 B2 20150513; KR 101018576 B1 20110303; KR 20090007438 A 20090116; RU 2008149530 A 20100627; RU 2428248 C2 20110910; US 2009297416 A1 20091203; US 9216381 B2 20151222

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110901

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHODIA OPERATIONS

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROHART, EMMANUEL

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PITOIS, CLAIRE

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOKOTA, KAZUHIKO

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BELLIERE-BACA, VIRGINIE

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HARLE, VIRGINIE

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS