Global Patent Index - EP 2024092 A1

EP 2024092 A1 2009-02-18 - DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AUTOMATICALLY THE INSERTION OF PLANT MATERIAL IN A SHREDDER

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AUTOMATICALLY THE INSERTION OF PLANT MATERIAL IN A SHREDDER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN STEUERUNG DES EINFÜHRENS VON PFLANZENMATERIAL IN EINER ZERKLEINERUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE AUTOMATIQUE DE L'INSERTION DE MATÉRIAUX VÉGÉTAUX DANS UN BROYEUR

Publication

EP 2024092 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07725539 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004642 W
  • IT MN20060045 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140890A1] A device for controlling automatically the insertion of plant material in a shredder (1) provided with an internal-combustion engine (2), comprising a sensor which is adapted to send a signal which is proportional to the supply of the internal-combustion engine to a control unit (8) which is adapted to process the signal by comparison with a preset value and to consequently transmit a pulse to an electric valve (10) which is capable of sending selectively oil to the hydraulic motor (4) of the feeder roller (3) for the material to be shredded, and directly to the discharge.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/22 (2006.01); A01G 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/2283 (2013.01); A01G 3/002 (2013.01); B02C 2018/164 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140890A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007140890 A1 20071213; WO 2007140890 A8 20080320; EP 2024092 A1 20090218; IT MN20060045 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-01-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161220

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081201

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS