Global Patent Index - EP 2024097 A1

EP 2024097 A1 2009-02-18 - LID FOR CLOSING A CENTRIFUGE ROTOR

Title (en)

LID FOR CLOSING A CENTRIFUGE ROTOR

Title (de)

DECKEL ZUM VERSCHLIESSEN EINES ZENTRIFUGENROTORS

Title (fr)

COUVERCLE SERVANT À FERMER LE ROTOR D'UNE CENTRIFUGEUSE

Publication

EP 2024097 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06753816 A

Priority

EP 2006004911 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134624A1] The present invention relates to a lid (4) for closing a centrifuge rotor (2), characterized by a positively locking rotation-activated closing mechanism (12, 16, 22, 24), which, prepositioned on the centrifuge rotor (2), moves automatically into a closed position by virtue of the intrinsic weight of the lid (4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/04 (2006.01); B04B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 7/02 (2013.01); B04B 5/0414 (2013.01); B04B 2007/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134624A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134624 A1 20071129; CN 101479045 A 20090708; CN 101479045 B 20120704; EP 2024097 A1 20090218; EP 2024097 B1 20140604; JP 2009537311 A 20091029; JP 4809474 B2 20111109; US 2011212819 A1 20110901; US 9149815 B2 20151006

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 13

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-06-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006013782

- Effective date: 20150305

2015-05-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150305

2015-03-05 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502006013782

2014-07-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502006013782

- Effective date: 20140710

2014-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2014-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2014-03-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140221

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-09-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU