Global Patent Index - EP 2024111 A1

EP 2024111 A1 2009-02-18 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROFILED BODIES

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING PROFILED BODIES

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PROFILKÖRPERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR PRODUIRE DES CORPS PROFILÉS

Publication

EP 2024111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722115 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000556 W
  • DE 102006025034 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006025034A1] In a process to manufacture cylindrical lamella holders for an automotive clutch, the segmented sections (13) share a common external groove cut in the outer edge. During the cutting process the assembled segments move together under a single drive. Their drive operates independently of the segment rolling action against the work piece (9).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 1/20 (2006.01); B21D 15/02 (2006.01); B21H 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21H 1/20 (2013.01); B21D 17/04 (2013.01); B21H 5/02 (2013.01); B21H 5/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137543A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH CZ DE FR IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025034 A1 20071129; AT 514500 T 20110715; CA 2653049 A1 20071206; CA 2653049 C 20140408; EP 2024111 A1 20090218; EP 2024111 B1 20110629; EP 2024111 B8 20110921; MX 2008015034 A 20081210; US 2009126440 A1 20090521; US 8596104 B2 20131203; WO 2007137543 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2012-08-02 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007007553

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-06-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-22 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MUELLER WEINGARTEN AG, 88250 WEINGARTEN, DE

- Document: DE 502007007553

- Effective date: 20120126

2011-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2011-08-18 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007007553

- Effective date: 20110818

2011-07-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SCHULER PRESSEN GMBH

2011-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2011-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH CZ DE FR IT LI

2009-06-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH CZ DE FR IT LI

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081119

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS