Global Patent Index - EP 2024115 A1

EP 2024115 A1 2009-02-18 - METHOD AND STRAND-GUIDING DEVICE FOR GUIDING A CAST STRAND

Title (en)

METHOD AND STRAND-GUIDING DEVICE FOR GUIDING A CAST STRAND

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND STRANGFÜHRUNGSEINRICHTUNG ZUM FÜHREN EINES GEGOSSENEN STRANGS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE DE CORDE SERVANT À GUIDER UNE CORDE MOULÉE

Publication

EP 2024115 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724297 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003359 W
  • DE 102006022690 A
  • DE 102006052138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131584A1] The invention relates to a method and a strand-guiding device for guiding and regulating the temperature of a strand, in particular of steel, in sizes which have at least one edge (2, 3). In this case, the at least one edge (2, 3) is heated by supplying energy in order to avoid stress formation and/or crack formation. Provision is made according to the invention for the edges (2, 3) of the strand (1) to be heated in the strand-guiding region through the use of porous-burner zones (6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/12 (2006.01); B21B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/1213 (2013.01); B22D 11/128 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131584A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006052138 A1 20071122; EP 2024115 A1 20090218; WO 2007131584 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130926

2013-07-17 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20130617

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-11-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091007

2009-06-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS SIEMAG AG

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS