Global Patent Index - EP 2024132 A1

EP 2024132 A1 2009-02-18 - LASER MACHINING MACHINE WITH A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING THE LASER BEAM CHANNELS AND PROCEDURE FOR THE VENTILATION OF LASER BEAM CHANNELS OF A LASER MACHINING MACHINE

Title (en)

LASER MACHINING MACHINE WITH A DEVICE FOR VENTILATING THE LASER BEAM CHANNELS AND PROCEDURE FOR THE VENTILATION OF LASER BEAM CHANNELS OF A LASER MACHINING MACHINE

Title (de)

LASERBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE MIT EINER EINRICHTUNG ZUM BELÜFTEN DER LASERSTRAHLFÜHRUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BELÜFTEN DER LASERSTRAHLFÜHRUNG EINER LASERBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE D'USINAGE AU LASER AVEC UN DISPOSITIF DE VENTILATION DU GUIDAGE DU RAYON LASER ET PROCEDE DE VENTILATION DU GUIDAGE DU RAYON LASER D'UNE MACHINE D'USINAGE AU LASER

Publication

EP 2024132 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 06753535 A

Priority

EP 2006004338 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128333A1] A laser machining machine (101) features a device for ventilating the laser beam channels (106) on the laser machining head (104), over which the beam channel (106) is formed open in the direction of the tool (107'). At the same time, a first gas inlet (111) into the laser beam channel (106) for a first gas and a second gas inlet (112) into the laser beam channel (106) for a second gas are provided.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/12 (2006.01); B23K 26/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/123 (2013.01); B23K 26/12 (2013.01); B23K 26/125 (2013.01); B23K 26/128 (2013.01); B23K 26/142 (2015.10); B23K 26/1436 (2015.10)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007128333 A1 20071115; CN 101443154 A 20090527; CN 101443154 B 20121024; EP 2024132 A1 20090218; US 2009120917 A1 20090514; US 8203098 B2 20120619

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180430

2017-01-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161209

2012-07-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KOCH, REINER

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LINK, GERHARD

2009-04-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BIHLER, JOCHEN

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU