Global Patent Index - EP 2024135 A1

EP 2024135 A1 2009-02-18 - DEVICE AND METHOD OF TRIMMING A LENS INCLUDING VERIFICATION OF THE ADEQUACY OF A LOCK ADAPTER OF SAID LENS WITH A CHARACTERISTIC OF THIS LENS OR ITS DESIRED SHAPE

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD OF TRIMMING A LENS INCLUDING VERIFICATION OF THE ADEQUACY OF A LOCK ADAPTER OF SAID LENS WITH A CHARACTERISTIC OF THIS LENS OR ITS DESIRED SHAPE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTURFRÄSEN EINER LINSE MIT VERIFIKATION DER ÜBEREINSTIMMUNG EINES VERRIEGELUNGSADAPTERS DER LINSE MIT EINER EIGENSCHAFT DIESER LINSE ODER IHRER GEWÜNSCHTEN FORM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE DETOURAGE D'UNE LENTILLE COMPORTANT LA VERIFICATION DE L'ADEQUATION D'UN ADAPTATEUR DE BLOCAGE DE LADITE LENTILLE AVEC UNE CARACTERISTIQUE DE CETTE LENTILLE OU SON CONTOUR SOUHAITE

Publication

EP 2024135 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07731450 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000809 W
  • FR 0605085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141402A1] The present invention concerns a method of trimming an optical lens, including the machining of a lens (100) based on a desired shape (120) in conformance with a programmed machining cycle, the lends being secured by at least one lock adapter (101, 102) applied on one surface (108, 109) of said lens. Prior to this machining, at least one geometric characteristic (115, 125) of the lock adapter by scanning with or without contact, and the adequacy of the geometric characteristic acquired by the lock adapter in comparison with the desired shape of the lens or a characteristic of the lens is verified. The invention also concerns a device for implementing such method.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 13/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/148 (2013.01); B24B 13/0055 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141402A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007141402 A1 20071213; DE 602007007321 D1 20100805; EP 2024135 A1 20090218; EP 2024135 B1 20100623; FR 2902033 A1 20071214; FR 2902033 B1 20090227

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL, FR

- Effective date: 20180601

2018-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL COMPAGNIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE, CHARENTON, FR

- Document: DE 602007007321

2018-04-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007007321

- Representative's name: 24IP LAW GROUP SONNENBERG FORTMANN, DE

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20101004

2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110511

2012-01-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110511

2011-07-14 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007007321

- Effective date: 20110323

2011-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100623

2010-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007007321 P 20100805

2010-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-08-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090714

2009-07-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS