Global Patent Index - EP 2024150 A1

EP 2024150 A1 2009-02-18 - PORTABLE POWER TOOL HAVING A TOOL DRIVEN IN AN OSCILLATING AND PENDULOUS MANNER

Title (en)

PORTABLE POWER TOOL HAVING A TOOL DRIVEN IN AN OSCILLATING AND PENDULOUS MANNER

Title (de)

HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINE MIT OSZILLIEREND UND PENDELND ANGETRIEBENEM WERKZEUG

Title (fr)

MACHINE-OUTIL À MAIN AVEC OUTIL ENTRAÎNÉ EN OSCILLATION ET EN MOUVEMENT PENDULAIRE

Publication

EP 2024150 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07727439 A

Priority

  • EP 2007052967 W
  • DE 102006022804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131831A1] The invention relates to a portable power tool (2) comprising a drive motor and a tool (4) which is driven by the drive motor and which, during operation of the drive motor, performs an oscillating movement, on which a pendulous movement is superimposed. Provision is made for the tool (4) to move in a pendulous manner about a pivot axis (40) which moves back and forth along a path (44) of motion.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27B 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27B 19/006 (2013.01); B24B 23/04 (2013.01); B27C 1/002 (2013.01); B27F 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131831A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB HU

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022804 A1 20071122; CN 101443166 A 20090527; CN 101443166 B 20120620; DE 502007004574 D1 20100909; EP 2024150 A1 20090218; EP 2024150 B1 20100728; WO 2007131831 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170529

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20170316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-08-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007004574

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-03-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E009417

2010-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007004574 P 20100909

2010-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB HU

2010-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-08-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-05 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB HU

2009-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081216

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS