Global Patent Index - EP 2024156 A1

EP 2024156 A1 2009-02-18 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF AN EXTRUDED PLASTICS FOIL, AND USE OF THE PLASTICS FOIL

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF AN EXTRUDED PLASTICS FOIL, AND USE OF THE PLASTICS FOIL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER EXTRUDIERTEN KUNSTSTOFF-FOLIE, SOWIE VERWENDUNG DER KUNSTSTOFFOLIE

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE FEUILLE DE PLASTIQUE EXTRUDÉE ET UTILISATION DE LA FEUILLE DE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 2024156 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07730009 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055651 W
  • DE 102006027004 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2654598A1] Process for production of an extruded single- or multilayer plastics foil , where the plastics foil is, during or after the extrusion process, at leas t sectionally provided with a structure, and use of a foil produced by this process, for packaging purposes.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 43/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 59/007 (2013.01); B29C 43/222 (2013.01); B32B 3/30 (2013.01); B32B 15/08 (2013.01); B32B 15/20 (2013.01); B32B 27/06 (2013.01); B32B 27/32 (2013.01); B32B 27/36 (2013.01); C08J 5/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141327A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006027004 A1 20071213; CA 2654598 A1 20071213; EP 2024156 A1 20090218; RU 2008137087 A 20100320; RU 2412810 C2 20110227; US 2009134547 A1 20090528; WO 2007141327 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121127

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090403

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELM, ROLAND

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, JOSEF

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DIE ANDERE ERFINDER HABEN AUF IHRE NENNUNG VERZICH

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080616

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS