Global Patent Index - EP 2024167 A2

EP 2024167 A2 2009-02-18 - DEVICE FOR WELDING A FILM WEB

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR WELDING A FILM WEB

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERSCHWEISSEN EINER FOLIENBAHN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE D'UNE PELLICULE EN BANDE

Publication

EP 2024167 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07723679 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002733 W
  • DE 102006022192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131573A2] The invention relates to a device (1) comprising two welding jaws (2, 3) that can be displaced towards one another in order to weld a formed film web (4) or tubular film (5). In said device, each welding jaw (2, 3) is connected to a separate jaw support (7, 8), preferably by means of a jaw holder (6). A drive (9) comprising two linear motors (10, 11) is connected to the jaw supports (7, 8) by means of a mechanism in order to generate an opposing jaw displacement. To achieve a compact construction for the drive (9), the secondary parts (13, 15) of the linear motors (10, 11) are interconnected by means of a magnetic shielding (19) and thus form a unit (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 65/18 (2006.01); B65B 51/30 (2006.01); H02K 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B29C 66/8244 (2013.01); B29C 65/18 (2013.01); B29C 65/745 (2013.01); B29C 66/4312 (2013.01); B29C 66/80 (2013.01); B29C 66/82 (2013.01); B29C 66/8322 (2013.01); B29C 66/849 (2013.01); B65B 51/303 (2013.01); B29C 65/02 (2013.01); B29C 66/1122 (2013.01); B29C 66/8511 (2013.01); B29C 2793/0045 (2013.01); B29K 2995/0007 (2013.01); B29L 2023/001 (2013.01); Y10T 156/17 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B29C 66/8511 + B29C 65/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022192 A1 20071115; DE 102006022192 B4 20090827; EP 2024167 A2 20090218; US 2009301661 A1 20091210; WO 2007131573 A2 20071122; WO 2007131573 A3 20090416

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140423

2011-10-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROVEMA GMBH

2011-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101201

2010-06-02 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20101102

2010-05-19 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-03-24 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-05-20 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS