Global Patent Index - EP 2024197 A1

EP 2024197 A1 2009-02-18 - TRANSMISSION FOR TRANSMITTING A DRIVE TORQUE FROM ONE DRIVE SHAFT TO TWO OUTPUT SHAFTS

Title (en)

TRANSMISSION FOR TRANSMITTING A DRIVE TORQUE FROM ONE DRIVE SHAFT TO TWO OUTPUT SHAFTS

Title (de)

GETRIEBEEINHEIT ZUR FÜHRUNG EINES ANTRIEBSMOMENTS VON EINER ANTRIEBSWELLE AUF ZWEI ABTRIEBSWELLEN

Title (fr)

UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION DESTINÉE À TRANSMETTRE UN COUPLE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT D'UN ARBRE D'ENTRÉE À DEUX ARBRES DE SORTIE

Publication

EP 2024197 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729511 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055082 W
  • DE 102006025062 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007138001A1] The invention relates to a transmission, in particular a rear axle transmisssion for transmitting a drive torque from one drive shaft (2) to two output shafts (3, 5) by means of a differential unit (15) and a continuously variable device (14) for influencing the distribution rate of the drive torque to the output shafts (3, 5), said device being activated by means of at least one motor (37). The differential unit (15) comprises a differential (17) and a differential cage (19) that is operatively connected to the drive shaft (2) and the device (14) for influencing the distribution rate of the drive torque has at least one planetary gear set as the transmission ratio stage (39), which is operatively connected to the differential cage (19) and an associated output shaft (3 and 5) and which has a braking device (61). According to the invention, the braking device (51) is laterally offset in the direction of a planetary gear axis (Z) and lies next to planetary gears (69, 71) of the transmission ratio stage (39), at least approximately inside the radial extension area of the planetary gears (69, 71) and around the longitudinal axis (X) of the output shafts (3, 5).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 23/08 (2006.01); F16H 48/30 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 48/30 (2013.01); F16H 48/08 (2013.01); F16H 48/11 (2013.01); F16H 48/22 (2013.01); F16H 48/295 (2013.01); F16H 48/34 (2013.01); F16H 2048/204 (2013.01); F16H 2048/343 (2013.01); F16H 2048/423 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007138001A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025062 A1 20071206; EP 2024197 A1 20090218; JP 2009539044 A 20091112; US 2009192006 A1 20090730; WO 2007138001 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2013-05-01 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20121220

2012-12-20 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BOECK, ALOIS

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAASCH, DETLEF

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETER, ROBERT

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KNEDLER, FLORIAN

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DONAUBAUER, MICHAEL

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081014

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS