Global Patent Index - EP 2024235 A1

EP 2024235 A1 2009-02-18 - VERTICAL BAGGING MACHINE COMPRISING TWO LINEAR MOTORS

Title (en)

VERTICAL BAGGING MACHINE COMPRISING TWO LINEAR MOTORS

Title (de)

VERTIKALE SCHLAUCHBEUTELMASCHINE MIT ZWEI LINEARMOTOREN

Title (fr)

ENSACHEUSE VERTICALE COMPORTANT DEUX MOTEURS LINEAIRES

Publication

EP 2024235 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07723678 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002732 W
  • DE 102006022193 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131572A1] The invention relates to a vertical bagging machine (1), equipped with a first linear motor (18) for displacing a transversal seal unit (10) in a first direction, preferably vertically (20), and a second linear motor (19) for executing a displacement in a second direction, preferably horizontally (21 ), in order to displace a heat-sealing jaw (11) in the latter direction or to cause two heat-sealing jaws (11, 12) to be displaced against one another by means of a gear (22). The linear motors (18, 19) are interconnected (23) by means of a cross formation. Each linear motor (18, 19) consists of a primary part (24, 26) and a secondary part (25, 27). The cross formation (23) forms a stable connection for the linear motors (18, 19) that act in displacement directions running perpendicularly to one another.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/30 (2006.01); B65B 65/00 (2006.01); B65B 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/30 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65B 65/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131572A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022193 A1 20071115; DE 102006022193 B4 20090827; EP 2024235 A1 20090218; US 2009260333 A1 20091022; US 7866131 B2 20110111; WO 2007131572 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120328

2011-12-14 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-10-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROVEMA GMBH

2010-06-02 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20101102

2010-05-19 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20100201

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS