Global Patent Index - EP 2024242 A1

EP 2024242 A1 2009-02-18 - SYSTEM CRATE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRANSPORTING FRESH FISH

Title (en)

SYSTEM CRATE, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRANSPORTING FRESH FISH

Title (de)

SYSTEMKISTE INSBESONDERE FÜR DEN TRANSPORT VON FRISCHEM FISCH

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CAISSES EN PARTICULIER POUR LE TRANSPORT DE POISSONS FRAIS

Publication

EP 2024242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725559 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004663 W
  • DE 102006025198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2653505A1] The present invention relates to a crate (2) of a system of crates, in pa rticular for transporting fresh fish, which has an opening (16) on the top s ide, and wherein the edge area as well as the base area of the opening on th e top side are designed in such a manner that the base area on the edge of t he opening on the top side is laterally and positively placed on an identica l crate; thus the crates can be stacked on top of each other such that the u pper crate can be inserted into the lower crate, rotated about a vertical ax is by 180°, and thus the empty boxes can be stacked into one another (180° s tack-nest crate),and said crate is thereby characterized in that the edge ar ea (10) of the opening on the top side is designed, at least in terms of are a, in a channel shape and has at least one first through hole (30) which is located on the outer side at the bottom of the crate wall adjacent to the ed ge area, and in that the base of the crate features a second through hole (3 0) so that liquid can drain out of the crate through the second through hole into the channel-shaped area of a similar crate stacked below, and then thr ough the first through hole of the crate stacked below, out of the channel-s haped area alongside the outer side crate wall adjacent to the edge area of the lower side.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/261 (2013.01); B65D 21/0235 (2013.01); B65D 21/045 (2013.01); B65D 85/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137774A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025198 A1 20071206; BR PI0711728 A2 20111129; CA 2653505 A1 20071206; CA 2653505 C 20150714; CY 1113589 T1 20160622; DK 2024242 T3 20121015; EC SP088917 A 20090227; EP 2024242 A1 20090218; EP 2024242 B1 20120725; ES 2391478 T3 20121127; HR P20120850 T1 20121130; ME 01499 B 20140420; MX 2008015186 A 20090305; NO 20085395 L 20081229; NO 339546 B1 20161227; PT 2024242 E 20121029; RS 52503 B 20130430; RU 2008150761 A 20100710; RU 2443612 C2 20120227; SI 2024242 T1 20121130; US 2010096288 A1 20100422; US 8668089 B2 20140311; WO 2007137774 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-09-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-09-28 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20180523

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-09-28 [PGFP MT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP SI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180502

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20180424

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP LV] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Payment date: 20180417

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20180516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180516

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP IS] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180530

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP BG] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Payment date: 20180427

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-08-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20180425

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20180420

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180524

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180518

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20180601

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP SK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Payment date: 20180412

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP EE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Payment date: 20180411

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP LT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Payment date: 20180416

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180413

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-06-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20180423

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-07-31 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20170509

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-02-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2016-05-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: KOPF WESTENBERGER WACHENHAUSEN PATENTANWAELTE , DE

2016-04-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2015-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: EIGERSTRASSE 2 POSTFACH, 3000 BERN 14 (CH)

2015-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS-GMBH, DE

2015-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: KOPF WESTENBERGER WACHENHAUSEN PATENTANWAELTE , DE

2015-01-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

2013-08-22 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130426

2013-06-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E015536

2013-01-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20120402387

- Effective date: 20121122

2013-01-02 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 12684

2012-12-31 [REG PL T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2012-12-17 [REG EE FG4A] TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA

- Document: EE E007123

- Effective date: 20121016

2012-11-27 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2391478 T3

- Effective date: 20121127

2012-11-14 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2012-11-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2012-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2012-10-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20121017

2012-10-18 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2012-10-15 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2012-09-20 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007010269

- Effective date: 20120920

2012-08-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2012-08-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 567596 T

- Effective date: 20120815

2012-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-07-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-07-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2012-07-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-05-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090409

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS