Global Patent Index - EP 2024250 A1

EP 2024250 A1 2009-02-18 - VACUUM-SEALED CHAMBER

Title (en)

VACUUM-SEALED CHAMBER

Title (de)

VAKUUM-FRISCHHALTEKAMMER

Title (fr)

COMPARTIMENT DE CONSERVATION SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 2024250 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729192 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054744 W
  • CN 200620071500 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135046A1] The invention relates to a vacuum-sealed chamber comprising a vacuum-sealed chamber body (1), a vacuum-sealed chamber cover (2), a vacuum-generating device (3), a vacuum-eliminating device (4), and a starting device (5). During the operation of said starting device (5), the vacuum-sealed chamber cover (2) is detached from the vacuum-sealed chamber body (1), and the starting device (5) drives the vacuum-eliminating device (4) such that the pressure inside and outside the vacuum-sealed chamber is equalised. In this way, the vacuum-sealed chamber can be ventilated and opened simultaneously, alleviating the user.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/20 (2006.01); A47J 47/10 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47J 47/10 (2013.01); B65D 81/2038 (2013.01); F25D 17/042 (2013.01); F25D 2317/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135046A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135046 A1 20071129; CN 2900399 Y 20070516; EP 2024250 A1 20090218; RU 2008148160 A 20100627; RU 2438945 C2 20120110

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151027

2015-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS