Global Patent Index - EP 2024253 A1

EP 2024253 A1 2009-02-18 - SEALED ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A FLOW-LIMITING DEVICE, FOR THE STORAGE AND DISPENSING OF SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS

Title (en)

SEALED ARRANGEMENT COMPRISING A FLOW-LIMITING DEVICE, FOR THE STORAGE AND DISPENSING OF SOLID PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS

Title (de)

ABGEDICHTETE ANORDNUNG MIT EINER STRÖMUNGSBEGRENZUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUM LAGERN UND ABGEBEN VON FESTEN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN PRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE OPERCULE DE STOCKAGE ET DE DISTRIBUTION AVEC LIMITEUR DE DEBIT, DE PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES SOLIDES

Publication

EP 2024253 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07731467 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000831 W
  • FR 0604538 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007267304A1] The present invention relates to an assembly for the storage and distribution of solid loosely packed products unit by unit. The assembly generally comprises a storage container, a sealing means and a discharge control device inserted into the neck of the container to permit the passage of the products to be distributed. Inviolability and sealing of the container are achieved by means of a peelable heat seal, sealed thermally onto at least one surface defined by an annular, peripheral surface of the neck of the container and/or all or part of an upper surface of the device and/or a surface of a distribution opening.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0481 (2013.01); B65D 51/185 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0031 (2013.01); B65D 2251/009 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135277A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007267304 A1 20071122; US 7780008 B2 20100824; DE 602007002713 D1 20091119; EP 2024253 A1 20090218; EP 2024253 B1 20091007; FR 2901253 A1 20071123; FR 2901253 B1 20080815; WO 2007135277 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180525

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170731

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170530

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-04-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-04-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-10-11 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

- Effective date: 20130910

2013-10-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUCTION (FRANCE) S.A.S., FR

- Effective date: 20130910

2013-10-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130905 AND 20130911

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUCTION (FRANCE) S.A.S., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AIRSEC, CHOISY-LE-ROI, FR

- Document: DE 602007002713

- Effective date: 20130612

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007002713

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

- Effective date: 20130612

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007002713

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PA, DE

- Effective date: 20130612

2013-06-28 [REG CH PFUS] MERGER

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUCTION (FRANCE) S.A.S., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AIRSEC, FR

2013-06-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007002713

- Representative's name: HOFFMANN - EITLE, DE

2012-04-30 [PGRI LI] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-04-30 [PGRI CH] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Effective date: 20120111

2012-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2012-01-13 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 11.01.2012.

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100531

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: AIRSEC

- Free text: AIRSEC#6 RUE LOUISE MICHEL#94600 CHOISY-LE-ROI (FR) -TRANSFER TO- AIRSEC#6 RUE LOUISE MICHEL#94600 CHOISY-LE-ROI (FR)

2010-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100708

2009-11-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007002713 P 20091119

2009-10-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAGRAAF INTERNATIONAL SA

2009-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2009-10-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081124

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS