Global Patent Index - EP 2024265 A1

EP 2024265 A1 2009-02-18 - CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

CLAMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

KLEMMVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE

Publication

EP 2024265 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07722954 A

Priority

  • EP 2007001701 W
  • DE 102006022484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131562A1] The present invention relates to a clamping device (4) for clamping threads on a spindle of a spinning or twisting machine, the clamping device (4) being arranged on a top spindle part (1) and comprising a fixed clamping element (5) and an axially displaceable clamping element (6) which can be pressed by a spring force against the fixed clamping element (5), wherein centrifugal-force elements (9) can bias the displaceable clamping element (6) counter to the spring force by means of a force which spaces the displaceable clamping element (6) apart from the fixed clamping element (5) in the axial direction such that a clamping nip (16) forms between these elements and wherein the clamping device (4) has holders which serve for accommodating and guiding the centrifugal-force elements (9), the holders for the centrifugal-force elements (9) being arranged on that side of the clamping device (4) which is located opposite the clamping nip (16), and a compression spring (8) being arranged between the holders and the clamping nip (16).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/40 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); D01H 1/38 (2013.01); D01H 7/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007131562A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH CZ DE IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006022484 A1 20071115; DE 102006022484 B4 20170427; CN 101437741 A 20090520; CN 101437741 B 20120425; DE 502007003750 D1 20100624; EP 2024265 A1 20090218; EP 2024265 B1 20100512; JP 2009536989 A 20091022; WO 2007131562 A1 20071122

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180301

- Year of fee payment: 12

2014-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2014-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SAURER COMPONENTS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE COMPONENTS GMBH, DE

2013-12-05 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAURER COMPONENTS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OERLIKON TEXTILE COMPONENTS GMBH, 70736 FELLBACH, DE

- Document: DE 502007003750

- Effective date: 20131014

2011-06-01 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007003750

- Effective date: 20110214

2011-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110215

2010-06-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 502007003750 P 20100624

2010-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH CZ DE IT LI

2010-03-31 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-03-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OERLIKON TEXTILE COMPONENTS GMBH

2009-06-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH CZ DE IT LI

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081215

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS