Global Patent Index - EP 2024361 A1

EP 2024361 A1 2009-02-18 - 3-TETRAZOLYL INDAZOLES, 3-TETRAZOLYL PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES, AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

3-TETRAZOLYL INDAZOLES, 3-TETRAZOLYL PYRAZOLOPYRIDINES, AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

3-TETRAZOLYLINDAZOLE UND 3-TETRAZOLYLPYRAZOLOPYRIDINE SOWIE IHRE VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

3-TÉTRAZOLYLINDAZOLES ET 3-TÉTRAZOLYLPYRAZOLOPYRIDINES ET LEUR UTILISATION

Publication

EP 2024361 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724741 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003814 W
  • DE 102006021733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128454A1] The invention relates to novel 3-tetrazolyl indazole derivatives and 3-tetrazolyl pyrazolo[3,4-b]-pyridine derivatives, methods for producing the same, the exclusive or combined use thereof for treating and/or preventing diseases, and the use thereof for producing medicaments utilized for the treatment and/or prevention of diseases, particularly cardiovascular diseases.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 403/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/416 (2006.01); A61K 31/4162 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); C07D 405/14 (2006.01); C07D 409/14 (2006.01); C07D 471/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07D 403/04 (2013.01); C07D 409/14 (2013.01); C07D 471/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128454A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007128454 A1 20071115; CA 2651556 A1 20071115; DE 102006021733 A1 20071122; EP 2024361 A1 20090218; JP 2009536929 A 20091022; US 2010113507 A1 20100506

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2011-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110505

2009-09-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-09-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER SCHERING PHARMA AG

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081209

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS