Global Patent Index - EP 2024382 A2

EP 2024382 A2 2009-02-18 - HYBRID COMPOUNDS BASED ON POLYOL(S) AND AT LEAST ONE OTHER MOLECULAR ENTITY, POLYMER OR OTHERWISE, ESPECIALLY OF THE POLYORGANOSILOXANE TYPE, METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF, AND APPLICATIONS OF THE SAME

Title (en)

HYBRID COMPOUNDS BASED ON POLYOL(S) AND AT LEAST ONE OTHER MOLECULAR ENTITY, POLYMER OR OTHERWISE, ESPECIALLY OF THE POLYORGANOSILOXANE TYPE, METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION THEREOF, AND APPLICATIONS OF THE SAME

Title (de)

AUF POLYOL(EN) UND WENIGSTENS EINER ANDEREN MOLEKULAREN EINHEIT, POLYMER ODER NICHT, INSBESONDERE VOM POLYORGANOSILOXANTYP, BASIERENDE HYBRIDVERBINDUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSÉS HYBRIDES À BASE DE POLYOL(S) ET À BASE D'AU MOINS UNE AUTRE ENTITÉ MOLÉCULAIRE, POLYMÈRES OU NON, NOTAMMENT DE TYPE POLYORGANOSILOXANE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ET SES APPLICATIONS

Publication

EP 2024382 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07729152 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054702 W
  • FR 0651744 A
  • FR 0651745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007132000A1] The invention relates to novel hybrid compounds comprising at least one silicone entity (Si

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 23/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/03 (2006.01); A61K 8/04 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/10 (2006.01); C07D 249/04 (2006.01); C07D 275/04 (2006.01); C07H 5/04 (2006.01); C08G 77/26 (2006.01); C08G 77/388 (2006.01); C08G 77/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 77/388 (2013.01); A61K 8/898 (2013.01); A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); C07D 405/14 (2013.01); C07H 5/04 (2013.01); C07H 23/00 (2013.01); C08G 77/26 (2013.01); C08G 77/46 (2013.01); A61K 2800/57 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007132005A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007132000 A1 20071122; BR PI0711835 A2 20111213; EP 2024382 A2 20090218; EP 2024422 A1 20090218; JP 2009537484 A 20091029; WO 2007132005 A2 20071122; WO 2007132005 A3 20080424

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-19 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130919

2012-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120710

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLEURY, ETIENNE

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALILA, SAMI

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRIGUEZ, HUGUES

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COTTAZ, SYLVAIN

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAMAIDE, THIERRY

2009-12-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FORT, SEBASTIEN

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLEURY, ETIENNE

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HALILA, SAMI

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DRIGUEZ, HUGO

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: COTTAZ, SYLVAIN

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAMAIDE, THIERRY

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FORT, SEBASTIEN

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS