Global Patent Index - EP 2024383 A2

EP 2024383 A2 2009-02-18 - CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 11 BETA-(4-ACETYLPHENYL)-20,20,21,21,21-PENTAFLUOR-17ALPHA- HYDROXY-19-NOR-17 -PREGNA-4,9-DIEN-3-ONE

Title (en)

CRYSTALLINE FORMS OF 11 BETA-(4-ACETYLPHENYL)-20,20,21,21,21-PENTAFLUOR-17ALPHA- HYDROXY-19-NOR-17 -PREGNA-4,9-DIEN-3-ONE

Title (de)

KRISTALLINE FORMEN VON 11BETA-(4-ACETYLPHENYL)-20,20,21,21,21-PENTAFLUOR-17ALPHA- HYDROXY-19-NOR-17 -PREGNA-4,9-DIEN-3-ON

Title (fr)

FORMES CRISTALLINES DE LA 11BETA-(4-ACÉTYLPHÉNYL)-20,20,21,21,21-PENTAFLUORO-17ALPHA-HYDROXY-19-NOR-17 -PREGNA-4,9-DIÈN-3-ONE

Publication

EP 2024383 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725692 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004805 W
  • US 81012706 P
  • EP 06090095 A
  • EP 07725692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1862468A1] Crystalline 11beta -(4-acetylphenyl)-20,20,21,21,21-pentafluoro-17-hydroxy-19-nor-17alpha -pregna-4,9-dien-3-one (I) and its crystalline solvates are new. Independent claims are also included for two processes for preparing (I). ACTIVITY : Cytostatic; Gynecological. MECHANISM OF ACTION : None given.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07J 1/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/567 (2006.01); A61P 5/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 1/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140917A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1862468 A1 20071205; AR 061151 A1 20080806; AU 2007256432 A1 20071213; BR PI0713093 A2 20121016; CA 2654126 A1 20071213; EA 200802385 A1 20090630; EC SP088934 A 20090130; EP 2024383 A2 20090218; JP 2009538855 A 20091112; KR 20090016008 A 20090212; MX 2008015348 A 20081217; NO 20085417 A 20081230; TN SN08499 A1 20100414; US 2008085875 A1 20080410; US 7910573 B2 20110322; UY 30384 A1 20080331; WO 2007140917 A2 20071213; WO 2007140917 A3 20080410

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120807

2011-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAYER PHARMA AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2011-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101203

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BECKMANN, WOLFGANG

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WINTER, GABRIELE

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KRAEMER, EDDA

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GINKO, THOMAS

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AMOULONG, EVELIN

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CLEVE, ARWED

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080314

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS