Global Patent Index - EP 2024386 A2

EP 2024386 A2 2009-02-18 - USE OF PROTEINS AND PEPTIDES OF THE TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY FOR PURIFICATION AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS

Title (en)

USE OF PROTEINS AND PEPTIDES OF THE TGF-BETA SUPERFAMILY FOR PURIFICATION AND THERAPEUTIC METHODS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON PROTEINEN UND PEPTIDEN DER TGF-BETA-SUPERFAMILIE FÜR REINIGUNG UND THERAPEUTISCHE VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE PROTÉINES ET DE PEPTIDES DE LA SUPERFAMILLE TGF-BÊTA POUR DES PROCÉDÉS DE PURIFICATION ET DE THÉRAPIE

Publication

EP 2024386 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07777374 A

Priority

  • US 2007013053 W
  • US 81079806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007143161A2] Members of the TGF- ß superfamily and peptide fragments based on member proteins are employed to purify solutions containing member proteins or as therapeutics.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 1/22 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); C07K 14/495 (2006.01); C07K 14/51 (2006.01); C07K 17/02 (2006.01); G01N 33/543 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/6872 (2013.01); C07K 1/22 (2013.01); C07K 14/495 (2013.01); C07K 14/51 (2013.01); C07K 17/02 (2013.01); G01N 2333/525 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007143161A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007143161 A2 20071213; WO 2007143161 A3 20080529; AU 2007254824 A1 20071213; BR PI0712496 A2 20120925; CA 2654181 A1 20071213; CN 101511859 A 20090819; EP 2024386 A2 20090218; EP 2377876 A1 20111019; JP 2009539767 A 20091119; MX 2008015263 A 20081217

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120404

2010-04-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WYETH LLC

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090420

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LU, ZHIJIAN

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LIU, WEI

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ZHANG, JIMIN

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YAWORSKY, PAUL JOHN

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BROWN, CHRISTOPHER TODD

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OLLAND, STEPHANE H.

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHEN, EMILY SHENG-MING

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081204

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS