Global Patent Index - EP 2024415 A1

EP 2024415 A1 2009-02-18 - ELECTRONIC MOLDING COMPOSITION AND METHOD

Title (en)

ELECTRONIC MOLDING COMPOSITION AND METHOD

Title (de)

ELEKTRONIKFORMMASSE UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION ET PROCÉDÉ DE MOULAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE

Publication

EP 2024415 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 06759418 A

Priority

US 2006017952 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007130063A1] A curable molding composition is provided having a binder system and a filler system. The molding composition is useful as an electronic material composition for electronic devices.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08G 65/48 (2006.01); C08K 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08G 65/485 (2013.01); C08L 71/126 (2013.01); C08G 2650/04 (2013.01); C08K 9/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C08L 71/126 + C08L 2666/04

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007130063A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK YU

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007130063 A1 20071115; EP 2024415 A1 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-04 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127705

2010-10-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100427

2010-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-10-02 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127705

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081210

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK YU