Global Patent Index - EP 2024431 A2

EP 2024431 A2 2009-02-18 - BLOWING AGENT COMPOSITION

Title (en)

BLOWING AGENT COMPOSITION

Title (de)

BLÄHMITTELZUSAMMENSETZUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION D'AGENT D'EXPANSION

Publication

EP 2024431 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 07731825 A

Priority

  • FR 2007051013 W
  • FR 0602797 A
  • US 80046406 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2899234A1] Foaming agent comprises an organic solvent and a fluorinated compound e.g. haloketone, fluoroacid, fluoroester, fluoroamine, (hydro)fluoroether, (hydro)fluorothioether, (hydro) fluoroolefin, cyclic(hydro)fluorocarbon or iodofluoro(hydro)carbide.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08J 9/149 (2013.01); C08J 9/143 (2013.01); C08J 2203/12 (2013.01); C08J 2203/142 (2013.01); C08J 2203/146 (2013.01); C08J 2375/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007113435A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

FR 2899234 A1 20071005; FR 2899234 B1 20170217; AU 2007232416 A1 20071011; CA 2643856 A1 20071011; CN 101679661 A 20100324; EP 2024431 A2 20090218; JP 2009535432 A 20091001; KR 20090012211 A 20090202; MX 2008012351 A 20090306; US 2010174008 A1 20100708; WO 2007113435 A2 20071011; WO 2007113435 A3 20091210

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20121002

2010-11-17 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100802

2010-03-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C08J 9/14 20060101AFI20100125BHEP

2010-01-13 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20091210

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080825

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR