Global Patent Index - EP 2024445 A2

EP 2024445 A2 2009-02-18 - LOW-VOC HUMECTANT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS

Title (en)

LOW-VOC HUMECTANT FOR AQUEOUS PIGMENT PREPARATIONS

Title (de)

VOC-ARME FEUCHTHALTEMITTEL FÜR WÄSSRIGE PIGMENTPRÄPARATIONEN

Title (fr)

AGENT MOUILLANT A FAIBLE TENEUR EN COV POUR PREPARATIONS AQUEUSES DE PIGMENTS

Publication

EP 2024445 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07724364 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003427 W
  • DE 102006021178 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007128388A2] The invention relates to aqueous pigment preparations comprising, in addition to a colour-imparting organic or inorganic pigment, 0.1% to 20% by weight of a humectant having a VOC content of not more than 5% by weight as determined according to DIN EN ISO 11890-2, the humectant comprising at least one polyalkylene glycol obtainable by subjecting 1 to 500 mol of C<SUB>2</SUB> to C<SUB>4</SUB> alkylene oxide with a water content of less than 1% by weight to addition reaction with a starting alcohol having 1 to 6 carbon atoms and 1 to 6 hydroxyl groups, with a water content of less than 1% by weight.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09B 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09B 67/0089 (2013.01); C09B 67/006 (2013.01); C09B 67/0063 (2013.01); C09B 67/0084 (2013.01); C09C 1/48 (2013.01); C09D 11/322 (2013.01); C09D 17/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007128388A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006021178 A1 20071108; EP 2024445 A2 20090218; WO 2007128388 A2 20071115; WO 2007128388 A3 20080110

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-23 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110208

2010-11-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101020

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT FINANCE (BVI) LIMITED

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: AHRENS, HENDRIK

2009-05-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EFFING, JOCHEM

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS