Global Patent Index - EP 2024476 A2

EP 2024476 A2 2009-02-18 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING LOW-DP POLYMERIZED SURFACTANTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING LOW-DP POLYMERIZED SURFACTANTS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDER-DP-POLYMERISIERTEN TENSIDEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES TENSIOACTIFS POLYMERISES A FAIBLE DEGRE DE POLYMERISATION ET PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI

Publication

EP 2024476 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07754326 A

Priority

  • US 2007007791 W
  • US 42950306 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007259797A1] Provided are low-irritation personal care compositions comprising a low-DP polymerized surfactants. Also provided are methods of making and using such compositions.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/90 (2006.01); A61K 8/72 (2006.01); A61K 8/73 (2006.01); A61Q 5/02 (2006.01); A61Q 19/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 19/00 (2013.01); A61K 8/604 (2013.01); A61K 8/8164 (2013.01); A61K 2800/75 (2013.01); A61Q 19/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007259797 A1 20071108; US 7417020 B2 20080826; BR PI0711426 A2 20120731; CA 2651298 A1 20071115; CN 101460599 A 20090617; CN 101460599 B 20130605; EP 2024476 A2 20090218; EP 2024476 A4 20121017; EP 2024476 B1 20171115; JP 2009536199 A 20091008; JP 5847379 B2 20160120; KR 101440791 B1 20140918; KR 20090035481 A 20090409; RU 2008147904 A 20100610; RU 2473675 C2 20130127; WO 2007130237 A2 20071115; WO 2007130237 A3 20081218

INPADOC legal status


2018-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180817

2018-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171115

2018-08-17 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007053046

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171115

2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180313

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180329

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-12-21 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007053046

2017-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2017-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.

2017-08-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170714

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101AFI20170601BHEP

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/60 20060101ALI20170601BHEP

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 19/10 20060101ALI20170601BHEP

2017-07-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/81 20060101ALI20170601BHEP

2017-06-01 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 602007053046

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C11D0001900000

- IPC: A61Q0019000000

2016-08-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160802

2012-10-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120917

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/72 20060101ALI20120911BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 8/73 20060101ALI20120911BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11D 3/37 20060101ALI20120911BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 19/00 20060101ALI20120911BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61Q 5/02 20060101ALI20120911BHEP

2012-10-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C11D 1/90 20060101AFI20120911BHEP

2009-12-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2009-11-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081126

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS