Global Patent Index - EP 2024497 A2

EP 2024497 A2 2009-02-18 - LIGA AND LIGB PROTEINS (LEPTOSPIRAL IG-LIKE (LIG) DOMAINS) FOR VACCINATION AND DIAGNOSIS

Title (en)

LIGA AND LIGB PROTEINS (LEPTOSPIRAL IG-LIKE (LIG) DOMAINS) FOR VACCINATION AND DIAGNOSIS

Title (de)

LIGA- UND LIGB-PROTEINE (LEPTOSPIRAL IG-LIKE (LIG)-DOMÄNEN) ZUR IMPFUNG UND DIAGNOSE

Title (fr)

PROTÉINES LIGA ET LIGB (DOMAINES DE TYPE IG LEPTOSPIRE (LIG)) DESTINÉES À LA VACCINATION ET À L'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UN DIAGNOSTIC

Publication

EP 2024497 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 06828120 A

Priority

  • BR 2006000283 W
  • BR PI0505529 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007070996A2] The present invention refers to isolated DNA (deoxyribonucleic acid) molecules that encode for LigA and LigB proteins. The invention further refers to the use of fragments of these proteins in the diagnosis, and formulation of vaccines for prevention of infections caused by Leptospira in humans and animals.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/20 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/20 (2013.01); G01N 33/56911 (2013.01); G01N 2333/20 (2013.01); G01N 2469/20 (2013.01); Y02A 50/56 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007070996 A2 20070628; WO 2007070996 A3 20070920; BR PI0505529 A 20070925; CA 2634214 A1 20070628; EP 2024497 A2 20090218; EP 2024497 A4 20100317

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20180322

2012-08-01 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUNDACAO OSWALDO CRUZ - FIOCRUZ

2012-03-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORNELL RESEARCH FOUNDATION, INC.

2010-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100416

2010-03-17 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100212

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MEDEIROS, MARCO, ALBERTO

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DOS REIS, MITEMAYER, GALVAO

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DA SILVA, EVERTON, FAGONDE

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCBRIDE, ALAN, JOHN, ALEXANDER

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CRODA, JULIO, HENRIQUE, ROSA

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RAMOS, JOAO, GABRIEL, ROSA

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DELLAGOSTIN, ODIR, ANTONIO

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MCBRIDE, FLAVIA, WEYKAMP, CRUZ

2009-10-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KO, ALBERT, ICKSANG

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS