Global Patent Index - EP 2024512 A2

EP 2024512 A2 2009-02-18 - METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF FETAL ABNORMALITIES

Title (en)

METHODS FOR THE DIAGNOSIS OF FETAL ABNORMALITIES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE FÖTALER ANOMALITÄTEN

Title (fr)

MÉTHODES POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC DE CARACTÈRES ANORMAUX F TAUX

Publication

EP 2024512 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07784442 A

Priority

  • US 2007071250 W
  • US 80481706 P
  • US 82077806 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007147076A2] The present invention relates to methods for detecting, enriching, and analyzing rare cells that are present in the blood, e.g. fetal cells. The invention further features methods of analyzing rare cell(s) to determine the presence of an abnormality, disease or condition in a subject, e.g. a fetus by analyzing a cellular sample from the subject.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); C12P 19/34 (2006.01); G01N 33/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/6806 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6883 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/156 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/158 (2013.01); C12Q 2600/16 (2013.01); G01N 2015/1006 (2013.01); G01N 2015/1087 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007147076 A2 20071221; WO 2007147076 A3 20080403; EP 2024512 A2 20090218; EP 2024512 A4 20091209; EP 2366801 A1 20110921; EP 2366801 B1 20161019; EP 2548972 A1 20130123; HK 1162610 A1 20170811

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-08 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127892

2013-02-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120905

2012-01-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERINATA HEALTH, INC

2012-01-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLECTIVE DX CORPORATION

2012-01-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VERINATA HEALTH, INC

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLECTIVE DX CORPORATION

2011-07-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2011-05-18 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100702

2009-12-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20091109

2009-10-09 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127892

2009-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARTEMIS HEALTH, INC.

2009-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CELLECTIVE DX CORPORATION

2009-08-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GENERAL HOSPITAL CORPORATION

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/68 20060101AFI20090128BHEP

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G01N 33/48 20060101ALI20090128BHEP

2009-03-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12P 19/34 20060101ALI20090128BHEP

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS