Global Patent Index - EP 2024541 A1

EP 2024541 A1 2009-02-18 - A FILAMENT FOR TIRE CORD, A BUNDLE FOR TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME, A TWISTED YARN FOR TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME, AND A TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME

Title (en)

A FILAMENT FOR TIRE CORD, A BUNDLE FOR TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME, A TWISTED YARN FOR TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME, AND A TIRE CORD COMPRISING THE SAME

Title (de)

FILAMENT FÜR REIFENKORD, SELBIGES ENTHALTENDES BÜNDEL FÜR REIFENKORD, SELBIGES ENTHALTENDER ZWIRN FÜR REIFENKORD UND SELBIGES ENTHALTENDER REIFENKORD

Title (fr)

FILAMENT POUR CÂBLE PNEUMATIQUE, FAISCEAU DE FILAMENTS, FIL TORSADÉ ET CÂBLE DE PNEUMATIQUE COMPRENANT LEDIT FILAMENT

Publication

EP 2024541 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07746682 A

Priority

  • KR 2007002534 W
  • KR 20060047234 A
  • KR 20070050361 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007139311A1] The present invention relates to a filament fiber for a tire cord, a bundle for a tire cord including the same, a twisted yarn for a tire cord including the same, and a tire cord including the same, and more particularly, to a non-circular cross-section filament fiber for a tire cord, wherein cross-section shape deviation thereof is more than 1 and 3 or less, a bundle for a tire cord including the same, a twisted yarn for a tire cord including the same, and a tire cord including the same.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/48 (2006.01); D01F 2/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/48 (2013.01); B60C 9/0042 (2013.01); D01D 5/253 (2013.01); D01F 2/00 (2013.01); D01F 6/62 (2013.01); B60C 2009/0085 (2013.01); B60C 2009/0092 (2013.01); D01F 6/14 (2013.01); D01F 6/60 (2013.01); D01F 6/605 (2013.01); D10B 2201/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007139311 A1 20071206; EP 2024541 A1 20090218; EP 2024541 A4 20141224; KR 100995932 B1 20101122; KR 101150899 B1 20120529; KR 20070114012 A 20071129; KR 20100087062 A 20100803

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20160628

2016-09-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: KOLON INDUSTRIES, INC.

2016-03-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160217

2014-12-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20141126

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D02G 3/48 20060101AFI20141120BHEP

2014-12-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D01F 2/00 20060101ALI20141120BHEP

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS