Global Patent Index - EP 2024548 A1

EP 2024548 A1 2009-02-18 - METERING APPARATUS FOR FLOWABLE COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

METERING APPARATUS FOR FLOWABLE COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

DOSIERVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLIESSFÄHIGE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DOSAGE POUR COMPOSES LIQUIDS

Publication

EP 2024548 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07711871 A

Priority

  • EP 2007002059 W
  • DE 102006026800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140830A1] The invention relates to a metering apparatus for flowable preparations, comprising a metering unit having an energy source, a control unit and a sensor unit, and comprising at least one first container which contains a first preparation and can be coupled to the metering unit (2), wherein the metering unit comprises a micropump which can be controlled by the control unit and has a specific delivery quantity of less than 500 [l/min].

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/00 (2006.01); B67D 7/16 (2010.01); A47L 15/44 (2006.01); D06F 39/02 (2006.01); E03D 9/00 (2006.01); E03D 9/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/022 (2013.01); A47L 15/0055 (2013.01); A47L 15/4454 (2013.01); A47L 15/4463 (2013.01); E03D 9/005 (2013.01); E03D 9/03 (2013.01); A47L 2401/026 (2013.01); A47L 2501/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140830A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026800 A1 20071213; EP 2024548 A1 20090218; EP 2024548 B1 20151104; ES 2555754 T3 20160108; HU E028606 T2 20161228; JP 2009540273 A 20091119; US 2009194562 A1 20090806; WO 2007140830 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180330

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-31 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20180220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-05-31 [PGFP HU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: HU

- Payment date: 20180314

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20180308

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-08-31 [PG25 MT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 758598 T

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-01-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160309

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-28 [REG HU AG4A] FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS

- Document: HU E028606

2016-12-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2016-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160309

2016-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-09-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RECKITT BENCKISER FINISH B.V.

- Effective date: 20160804

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-08-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-08-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-08-04 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007014373

2016-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160205

2016-04-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-04-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160304

2016-04-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-03-10 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-03-09 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20151104

2016-01-08 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2555754 T3

- Effective date: 20160108

2015-12-17 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007014373

2015-12-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2015-11-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 758598 T

- Effective date: 20151115

2015-11-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-11-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-11-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2015-07-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150622

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUEFFELS, ARNO

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KESSLER, ARND

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PESSEL, FRANK

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIPFEL, JOHANNES

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JEKEL, MAREN

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUEKEN, MATTHIAS

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUEHLHAUSEN, HANS-GEORG

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NITSCH, CHRISTIAN

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUTTER-JENTSCH, RALPH

2015-07-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOHENADEL, KARL-HEINZ

2015-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E03D 9/00 20060101ALI20150505BHEP

2015-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 15/44 20060101ALI20150505BHEP

2015-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E03D 9/03 20060101ALI20150505BHEP

2015-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/02 20060101ALI20150505BHEP

2015-06-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 15/00 20060101AFI20150505BHEP

2015-05-05 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502007014373

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: D06F0039020000

- IPC: A47L0015000000

2012-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120816

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KESSLER, ARND

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUEFFELS, ARNO

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NITSCH, CHRISTIAN

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: JEKEL, MAREN

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZIPFEL, JOHANNES

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUEHLHAUSEN, HANS-GEORG

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PESSEL, FRANK

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BUTTER-JENTSCH, RALPH

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HOHENADEL, KARL-HEINZ

2009-04-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LUEKEN, MATTHIAS

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080825

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS