Global Patent Index - EP 2024588 A1

EP 2024588 A1 2009-02-18 - HANDLE CONFIGURATION

Title (en)

HANDLE CONFIGURATION

Title (de)

GRIFFANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE POIGNÉE

Publication

EP 2024588 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729012 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054560 W
  • DE 102006023635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134983A1] The invention relates to a handle configuration for a door, in particular for a motorized vehicle door, with an outside handle (1) mounted such that it can pivot, which is arranged on the outside on the type of exterior door fuselage (3) that has a concave external handle recess (2), where the outside handle (1) has a first (10) and a second bearing arm (20) arranged on the inside with the first bearing arm (10) mounted around a rotational axis (11), the outside handle (1) has face surfaces (5) in each of the areas of the first (10) and the second bearing arm (20) which face the exterior door fuselage (3) and with a gap (4) that exists between the face surface (5) and the exterior door fuselage (3). According to the invention, it is provided that the outside handle (1) is rotatably mounted in a guideway (12, 31), which is fundamentally matched to the contour of the concavity of the handle recess (2), by means of which a tolerance compensation can be achieved by moving the outside handle (1) along the guideway (12, 31), without a resulting contact of the outside handle (1) with the exterior door fuselage(3).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 85/16 (2013.01); E05B 79/06 (2013.01); Y10T 292/57 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006023635 A1 20071122; CN 101449014 A 20090603; CN 104763254 A 20150708; CN 104763255 A 20150708; EP 2024588 A1 20090218; EP 2024588 B1 20180321; US 2009302620 A1 20091210; US 8540293 B2 20130924; WO 2007134983 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007016115

2018-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2018-04-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 981287 T

- Effective date: 20180415

2018-03-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2018-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-11-08 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20171013

2017-11-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 85/16 20140101AFI20170928BHEP

2017-11-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E05B 79/06 20140101ALN20170928BHEP

2017-09-28 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 502007016115

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: E05B0065200000

- IPC: E05B0085160000

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100322

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS