Global Patent Index - EP 2024605 A1

EP 2024605 A1 2009-02-18 - WELDED LOW-PRESSURE TURBINE SHAFT

Title (en)

WELDED LOW-PRESSURE TURBINE SHAFT

Title (de)

GESCHWEISSTE ND-TURBINENWELLE

Title (fr)

ARBRE DE TURBINE BP SOUDÉ

Publication

EP 2024605 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07712292 A

Priority

  • EP 2007051743 W
  • EP 06010925 A
  • EP 07712292 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1860279A1] The machine has a shaft (1) formed from an inflow part (6) and an outflow part (7), where the parts are firmly bonded with one another by a welded joint (8). The inflow part is manufactured as a disk body. The shaft is provided in a low-pressure zone, which includes an inflow zone (2), where a medium e.g. vapor, flows in the low-pressure zone. The shaft includes a heat-resistant material e.g. chromium, molybdenum, nickel, tungsten and vanadium composition, at the inflow part which is arranged in the inflow zone.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/06 (2006.01); F01D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/063 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C22C 38/44 (2013.01); C22C 38/46 (2013.01); F01D 5/28 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0466 (2013.01); F05D 2300/131 (2013.01); F05D 2300/132 (2013.01); Y10S 464/902 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 1860279 A1 20071128; CN 101454541 A 20090610; CN 101454541 B 20110907; EP 2024605 A1 20090218; JP 2009538397 A 20091105; JP 5036811 B2 20120926; US 2009263249 A1 20091022; US 8083492 B2 20111227; WO 2007137884 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2012-01-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111205

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081009

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS