Global Patent Index - EP 2024608 A1

EP 2024608 A1 2009-02-18 - TURBO COMPRESSOR IN AN AXIAL TYPE OF CONSTRUCTION

Title (en)

TURBO COMPRESSOR IN AN AXIAL TYPE OF CONSTRUCTION

Title (de)

TURBOVERDICHTER IN AXIALBAUWEISE

Title (fr)

TURBOCOMPRESSEUR EN MONTAGE AXIAL

Publication

EP 2024608 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07785513 A

Priority

  • DE 2007000916 W
  • DE 102006024085 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2652272A1] Turbo compressor in an axial type of construction, having a bladed stator and a bladed rotor, and having a longitudinally split compressor casing and a guide blade ring with adjustable guide blades, wherein the guide blades a re pivotably mounted about radial axes radially within their aerofoil on an inner ring belonging to the stator. The inner ring is split, i.e. segmented, at at least two points of its circumference; furthermore, the inner ring ha s for each guide blade at least one bearing bush which can be inserted radia lly into an opening from inside.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 17/16 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/563 (2013.01); F01D 9/042 (2013.01); F01D 17/162 (2013.01); F04D 17/12 (2013.01); F05D 2240/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007134585A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006024085 A1 20071129; CA 2652272 A1 20071129; CA 2652272 C 20141125; EP 2024608 A1 20090218; EP 2024608 B1 20170329; US 2010232952 A1 20100916; US 8376692 B2 20130219; WO 2007134585 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20180103

2018-01-03 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007015548

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170522

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170524

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-05-11 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007015548

2017-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2017-03-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-12-07 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161111

2016-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20160616

2013-11-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES AG

2009-06-10 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-06-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081121

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS